Dogfen lywodraethu SIR THOMAS WHITE'S CHARITY
Rhif yr elusen: 218626

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JULY 1551 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF THE 21 MAY 1958, 18 DECEMBER 1967, 31 MAY 1973, 10 MARCH 1982, 23 MARCH 1984, 10 JULY 1991 AND 26 OCTOBER 1994
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO DISTRIBUTE PART OF INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF EACH OF THE CITIES OR TOWNS OF COVENTRY, NORTHAMPTON, LEICESTER, NOTTINGHAM AND WARWICK.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
SEE OBJECTS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.