Dogfen lywodraethu The Physiotherapy Benevolent Fund
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 12 DEC 1995 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 FEB 2015 as amended on 13 Jul 2018 as amended on 27 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY, BY MAKING LOANS OR GRANTS OF MONEY, IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS IN ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CLASSES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDHIP OR DISTRESS: (A) PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE BYE-LAWS OF THE SOCIETY; (B) PERSONS WHO HAVE CEASED TO BE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY (C) PERSONS WHO ARE ASSOCIATES OF THE SOCIETY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED BYE-LAWS; (D) PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN INSCRIBED ON A LIST MAINTAINED BY THE SOCIETY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE SAID BYE-LAWS.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.