Dogfen lywodraethu SUSSEX HOUSING ASSOCIATION FOR THE AGED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MODEL RULES H10 1968 (CHARITABLE) OF 12 FEBRUARY 1970 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 30 APRIL 1973 AND 19 NOVEMBER 1979 AND 29 NOVEMBER 1988 AND 11 OCTOBER 1991
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF (A) PROVIDING HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCCIATED AMENITIES FOR AGED PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO ATHEIR MEANS; (B) PROVIDING FOR AGEDD PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
EAST AND WEST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.