Dogfen lywodraethu HER ROYAL HIGHNESS PRINCESS CHRISTIAN'S HOSPITAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATIONS OF TRUST DATED 19TH JUNE 1926 AND 28TH OCTOBER 1950, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10TH APRIL 1981, 31ST MAY 1990 AND 21ST NOVEMBER 1994
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO BE USED AS A NURSING HOME T PROVIDE SURGICAL MEDICAL ORCONVALESCENT TREATMENT, ACCOMODATION AND ATTENTION FOR PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO ARE OF GENTLE BIRTH BUT WHO ARE UNABLE TO PAY SUCH FEES AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THEM TO OBTAIN ADMISSION INTO ANY OTHER FIRST RATE NURSING HOME AND FOR OTHER PERSONS.
Maes buddion
BERKSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.