Dogfen lywodraethu HULL YOUNG PEOPLE'S INSTITUTE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 15/06/2001 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/09/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BUT WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON YOUNG PERSONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS; AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
KINGSTON UPON HULL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.