Dogfen lywodraethu PENNY POT (CLACTON) LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 225767
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 SEPTEMBER 1950 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 24 JUNE 1970, 9 MARCH 1982, 22 MARCH 1983,10 FEBRUARY 1987, 29 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 5 JULY 2001.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A RESIDENTIAL HOME OR HOMES FOR ELDERLY PERSONS WITH LIMITED MEANS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NATIONAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.