Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Rhif yr elusen: 227746
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CHARTER OF INCORPORATION DATED 31 JULY 1929 AND SUPPLEMENTAL ROYAL CHARTERS DATED 5 MAY 1937, 28 APRIL 1970 , 4 JANUARY 1980, 29TH APRIL 1997 AND 7TH FEBRUARY 2001
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE BY ALL PRACTICABLE MEANS, THE ADVANCEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ALL QUESTIONS OR MATTERS RELATING TO OR HAVING FOR THEIR OBJECT THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC HEALTH AND OF HYGIENE IN ALL ITS BRANCHES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NATIONAL & OVERSEAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.