Elusennau cysylltiedig THE ROYAL INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Rhif yr elusen: 227746
Elusen a dynnwyd
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
DEED DATED 24/05/1897 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 08/11/1938, 20/02/1959, 29/01/1963 AND 24/11/1965.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) PAYMENT TO THE HARBEN LECTURER FOR DELIVERY OF THE HARBEN LECTURES 2) PROVISION OF A GOLD MEDAL TO BE AWARDE NO LESS THAN ONCE IN THREE YEARS 3) PAYMENT FOR ADVERTISING AND HOLDING THE HARBEN LECTURES AND PUBLICATION THEREOF 4) PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RESERVE FUND
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
- 12 Mai 1966 : Cofrestrwyd
- 02 Tachwedd 2010 : Tynnwyd
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.