Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRIENDS OF CROWBOROUGH HOSPITAL
Rhif yr elusen: 231379

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JUN 1859 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 23 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 22 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUN 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE HAVING FOR ITS OBJECT THEWELFARE OF THE CROWBOROUGH HOSPITAL, THE PATIENTS THEREIN, OR THE MEDICAL OR NURSING OR DOMESTIC STAFF OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
CROWBOROUGH AND ELSEWHERE.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.