Dogfen lywodraethu THE LUXFORD CENTRE
Rhif yr elusen: 233601
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1962, AS AMENDED 12 SEPTEMBER 1995, 10 MAY 1997, 11 MAY 2002 AND 10 MAY 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE TOWN OF UCKFIELD AND THE PARISHES OF MARESFIELD, BUXTED, FRAMFIELD, LITTLE HORSTED, AND ISFIELD
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
UCKFIELD, AND PARISHES OF MARESFIELD, BUXTED, FRAMFIELD, LITTLE HORSTED, AND ISFIELD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.