Dogfen lywodraethu WORLD CONFEDERATION FOR PHYSICAL THERAPY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 1951, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 04/JULY/1988, 01/JANUARY/1991, 28/JULY/1991AND 18/JUNE/ 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 MAY 2015 as amended on 09 May 2019 as amended on 20 Jun 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PHYSICAL THERAPY. 1.3.2 ENCOURAGE THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROMOTE THE STRENGTH OF NATIONAL ORGANISATIONS OF PHYSICAL THERAPISTS 1.3.3 ENCOURAGE COMMUNICATION AND EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION INCLUDING ORGANISATION OF INTERNATIONAL CONGRESSES OF PHYSICAL THERAPISTS 1.3.4 REPRESENT PHYSICAL THERAPY INTERNATIONALLY 1.3.5 PROMOTE THE HEALTH, WELLNESS, AND FITNESS OF GLOBAL POPULATIONS 1.3.6 CO-OPERATE WITH RELEVANT INTERNATIONAL AND NATIONAL ORGANISATIONS 1.3.7 COMMENT ON SOCIAL AND POLITICAL ISSUES RELEVANT TO HEALTH 1.3.8 ENGAGE IN ALL NECESSARY ACTIVITIES TO FURTHER THE WORK OF WCPT IN THE BEST INTERESTS OF PHYSICAL THERAPISTS AND THE PROFESSION OF PHYSICAL THERAPY 1.3.9 ENGAGE IN ALL NECESSARY ACTIVITIES TO FURTHER THE WORK OF WCPT IN THE BEST INTERESTS OF USERS OF PHYSICAL THERAPIST SERVICES
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.