Dogfen lywodraethu SS. JOHN AND ELIZABETH CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 21/05/1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 04/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/10/2014 as amended on 21 Jun 2021 as amended on 21 Jun 2021 as amended on 23 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 (A) (I) TO PROVIDE A HOSPITAL FOR THE RECEPTION CARE AND TREATMENT OF PATIENTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING FOR PATIENTS REQUIRING PALLIATIVE CARE. (II) TO SERVE THE SICK AND THE DYING AND TO CARE FOR THE PHYSICAL, SPIRITUAL AND EMOTIONAL NEEDS OF PATIENTS IRRESPECTIVE OF NATIONALITY OR RELIGION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.