Trosolwg o'r elusen HEWITT HOMES
Rhif yr elusen: 206611-3
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1955 AND SCHEMES OF 25 NOVEMBER 1963, DEEDS DATED 29 AUGUST 1968 AND 25 FEBRUARY 1974 AND SCHEME DATED 20 MAY 1998. as amended on 01 Apr 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
2) THE TRUSTEES MUST GIVE PREFERENCE TO PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
3) THE TRUSTEES MAY MAINTAIN A HOME OR HOMES FOR SUCH PERSONS.
4) THE TRUSTEES MAY MAKE CONDITIONS OF APPOINTING A RESIDENT THAT THEY MUST:
A) CONTRIBUTE A WEEKLY SUM (WHICH MUST NOT CAUSE THE RESIDENT HARDSHIP) TOWARDS THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE HOMES AND ESSENTIAL SERVICES IN THEM;
B) CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE COST OF LIGHTING AND HEATING THE HOMES AND PROVIDING HOT WATER FOR THEM.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
- 06 Awst 1964: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
- HEWITT HOMES FOR GENTLE POOR (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.