Dogfen lywodraethu BECKENHAM THEATRE TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 DEC 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 AUG 2023 as amended on 05 Dec 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE THEATRICAL ARTS, AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE THEATRICAL ARTS, BY THE AWARDING OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER COMMUNITY GROUPS, PROJECTS AND ORGANISATIONS, WORKING TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
BECKENHAM AND DISTRICT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.