Hanes ariannol CANONESSES REGULAR OF SAINT AUGUSTINE OF THE PRIORY OF OUR LADY OF GOOD COUNSEL
Rhif yr elusen: 236981
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £180.99k | £210.12k | £164.36k | £196.44k | £184.66k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £199.99k | £178.35k | £198.49k | £159.38k | £190.41k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.