Dogfen lywodraethu DANSKE KIRKE I LONDON (DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON)
Rhif yr elusen: 237897

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1957, 29 APRIL 1962, 7 APRIL 1977, 30 JANUARY 1994 AND 11 JULY 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PREACH THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL INCLUDING ARRANGING SERMONS AND CONDUCTING THE CHURCH'S CEREMONIES FOR DANISH IN THE LONDON AREA
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
LONDON AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.