Dogfen lywodraethu Little Baddow Almshouses
Rhif yr elusen: 239382

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 23 JUNE 1971, SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER DATED 27 NOVEMBER 1981, AND SCHEME DATED 7 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 10 APRIL 2007 as amended on 18 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF LITTLE BADDOW AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
PARISH OF LITTLE BADDOW.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.