Dogfen lywodraethu LADY WHITE AND POOR'S CHARITIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 2ND JULY 1858 ESTABLISHED BY COUNTY COURT ORDER OF 22 OCTOBER 1858, COUNTY COURT ORDER OF 5 NOVEMBER 1858, SCHEME OF 27 JULY 1900 AND DETERMINATION ORDER OF 6 MARCH 1906 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION 24 JULY 1997
Gwrthrychau elusennol
15S TO THE MOST DESERVING POOR OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF TUXFORD FOR BREAD. 10/- TO THE INCUMBENT OF THE PARISH OF TUXFORD FOR PREACHING A SERMON AND ADMINISTERING THE SACRAMENT ON GOOD FRIDAY. RESIDUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE DESERVING POOR RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF TUXFORD EITHER IN FUEL CLOTHING OR OTHER NECESSARIES OR COMFORTS OR IN GIFTS OF MONEY.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF TUXFORD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.