Trosolwg o'r elusen ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S CHARITY FOR POOR HOUSEHOLDERS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
Rhif yr elusen: 204665-57
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
FEOFFMENT DATED 16 MARCH 1621 AND BY WILL DATED 27 MARCH 1621 AND BY WILL DATED 27 MARCH 1627. SCHEME OF 2 NOVEMBER 1926 AND SCHEME OF 28 JULY 1942 AND 26 APRIL 1973
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PREFERENCE TO BE GIVEN TO POOR MEN OVER 55 YEARS.
Maes buddion
BRISTOL.
Hanes cofrestru
- 10 Hydref 2005: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1109141-16 BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN NEED CHARIT...
- 27 Ebrill 1962: Cofrestrwyd
- 10 Hydref 2005: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.