Dogfen lywodraethu THE BIRMINGHAM PROGRESSIVE SYNAGOGUE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION OF MAY 1963 AS AMENDED 13 NOVEMBER 1969 AND 16TH MAY 1973. AS AMENDED ON THE 12TH JULY 1998 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 05 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PROGRESSIVE JUDAISM; B) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND TO ARRANGE AND CONDUCT RELIGIOUS SERVICES; C) TO PROVIDE, ARRANGE AND CONDUCT RELIGIOUS EDUCATION; D) TO MAKE PROVISION FOR THE SOLEMNIZATION OF MARRIAGES; E) TO MAKE PROVISION FOR BURIAL AND CREMATION; F) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF PROSELYTES UNDER THE RULES OF LIBERAL JUDAISM. G) TO PERFORM SUCH OTHER RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE COUNCIL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; H) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER ACTS AND THINGS AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO THE AFORESAID OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.