Dogfen lywodraethu THE INCORPORATED ANGLO-AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSISTANCE FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1902 AS AMENDED 29TH MAY 1953, 5TH MAY 1964 AND 3RD JULY 1974 as amended on 17 Dec 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects for which the Association is established are: To render assistance to persons of British and American nationality in Italy who are in ill health and who in the opinion of the Association are deserving of such assistance and in particular by providing nurses and making loans or paying either in whole or in part for accommodation and for the services of doctors, surgeons and nurses whether in a hospital, a nursing home or in private apartments as well as for such medical treatment, surgical appliances and medicines as may from time to time be prescribed for such persons
Maes buddion
ITALY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.