JACOBSEN FOUNDATION LTD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Nid oes gwybodaeth ar gael am weithgareddau'r elusen.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 21 Medi 1965: Cofrestrwyd
- 23 Chwefror 2005: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2004 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2004 | Heb ei gyflwyno |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 OCTOBER 1934 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 8 MARCH 1950, 17 NOVEMBER 1954, 22 NOVEMBER 1956, 29 JUNE 1965 AND 21 MAY 1991.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROVISION FOR POOR OR AGED OR SICK OR NEEDY PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN OR CONNECTED WITH THE TRADES OR BUSINESSES OF PAPER-MAKING, PRINTING, LITHOGRAPHY, TYPOGRAPHY AND BOOKBINDING OR OF MANUFACTURING OR DEALING IN SUCH ARTICLES AS ARE GENERALLY MANUFACTURED OR DEALT IN BY WHOLESALE AND MANUFACTURING STATIONERS OR ANY ALLIED TRADE OR BUSINESS AND IN MAKING SUCH PROVISION TO GIVE PARTICULAR CONSIDERATION TO THE POOR OR AGED OR SICK NEEDY EMPLOYEES OR EX-EMPLOYEES FOR THE TIME BEING OF NEWTON MILL LTD OR OF ANY OTHER COMPANY WHICH SHALL ACQUIRE THE BUSINESS OF THE SAID COMPANY OR BE AMALGAMATED THEREWITH WHETHER SUCH EMPLOYEES OR EX-EMPLOYEES ARE OR THE NEEDY DEPENDANTS OR RELATIONS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window