Dogfen lywodraethu MRS ANN DUTTON'S CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
INDENTURES DATED 3 MARCH 1747, 3 FEBRUARY 1748, 18 APRIL 1752, 13 APRIL 1754 AND 6 FEBRUARY 1874. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 NOV 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: (1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION IN GREAT GRANSDEN, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (A) THE PROVISION OR SUPPORT OF PASTORAL, PRAYER AND/OR WORSHIP ACTIVITIES THROUGH COLLABORATION WITH MEMBER GROUPS OF CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND OR NOT. (B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, AS AN OUTWORKING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN CAFÉ”. (C)THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A BURIAL GROUND. (2) THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY BUT CAN BE LEASED IN FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITY’S OBJECT.
Maes buddion
GREAT GRANSDEN.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.