Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRADFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13/05/1921 AS AMENDED 31/01/1929, 25/04/1945, 02/12/1948, 10/03/1950, 30/07/1962, 18/03/1963, 03/05/1983, 14/05/91, 6/11/04
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ASSIST AND PROMOTE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF BRADFORD, AS NOW CONSTITUTED, AND ANY OTHER DIOCESE WHICH SHALL AT ANY TIME BE FORMED, WHOLLY OR IN PART, OUT OF SUCH DIOCESE OR ANY PART THEREOF, EITHER WITH OR WITHOUT THE ADDITION OF ANY PART OF PARTS OF OTHER DIOCESES
Maes buddion
DIOCESE OF BRADFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.