Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH PIG ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH JANUARY 1886 AS AMENDED 19TH OCTOBER 1965, 25TH APRIL 1977, 8TH NOVEMBER 1977, 10TH MAY 1978, 2 JULY 1980,AND 2 APRIL 1991 as amended on 19 Feb 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
For the benefit of the United Kingdom public to ensure the sustainable conservation and preservation of pedigree pig breeds and breeding groups of domestic pedigree pigs of importance including the promotion of pedigree pigs breeds at risk and having characteristics worthy of preservation in the interest of zoological research and education to ensure the preservation of genes of special or potential value in hybridisation and other work.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.