Dogfen lywodraethu THE INSTITUTE OF LEADERSHIP

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
INCORPORATED 21/03/1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/01/2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 JUN 2017 as amended on 28 Jun 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE SCIENCE OF LEADERSHIP AND MANAGEMENT (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INVOLVING THE STUDY OF THE SKILLS OF LEADERSHIP AND MANAGEMENT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.