Dogfen lywodraethu FRANCIS DRAKE FELLOWSHIP TRUST FUND
Rhif yr elusen: 248302

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 557 diwrnod
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH DECEMBER 1933 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS OF 1ST MAY 1935, 2ND APRIL 1937, 3RD JUNE 1938 AND 24TH FEBRUARY 1967.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE EDUCATION OR BENEFIT OF WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDENTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
UNRESTRICTED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.