Dogfen lywodraethu MERSEY KIDNEY RESEARCH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1965 AS AMENDED 14 APRIL 1986, 21 NOVEMBER 1988, 24 APRIL 1991, 22 JUNE 1992 AND 29 MARCH 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A)TO UNDERTAKE, PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT AND RESEARCH INTO THE TREATMENT OF SUCH DISEASES; (B)TO UNDERTAKE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT; (C)TO UNDERTAKE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP METHODS ENABLING THOSE WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN UNDER TREATMENT FOR CHRONIC RENAL DISEASE TO BE MEDICALLY REHABILITATED;
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.