Dogfen lywodraethu THE CENTRE FOR CRIME AND JUSTICE STUDIES (ISTD)

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/06/1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/02/2014 as amended on 24 Jun 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR OF THOSE ENGAGED IN THE ADMINISTRATION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND THE TREATMENT OF OFFENDERS, IN THE CAUSES AND PREVENTION OF DELINQUENCY AND CRIME, THE TREATMENT OF OFFENDERS AND THE PRINCIPLES AND OPERATION OF THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE PROCESS BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.