Dogfen lywodraethu CARLISLE DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMO & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MAY 1893 AS AMENDED 2 AP 1913, 14 MAR 1922, 2 NOV 1926, 29 APRIL 1927, 2 APRIL 1946, 17 MAR 1950, 4 APRIL 1970, 12 MAY 1973, 8 JUNE 1979, 11 MAY 1988, 25 JAN 1995, 31 NOV 2003 , 12 JULY 2006 10 NOV 2007 as amended on 15 Jun 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ACQUISITION OF PROPERTY, BOTH REAL AND PERSONAL BY GIFT SUBSCRIPTION, DEVISE, BEQUEST, PURCHASE OR OTHERWISE FOR THE SUPPORT, MAINTENANCE OR DEVELOPMENT OF, OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY CHARITY, CHARITABLE INSTITUTION, ORGANISATION, SOCIETY, ASSOCIATION OR FUND IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, WHOLLY OR PARTLY WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF CARLISLE IN THE MANNER AS SET FORTH IN CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION.
Maes buddion
DIOCESE OF CARLISLE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.