Dogfen lywodraethu THE STRATEGIC PLANNING SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
M AND A OF ASSOC. INC. 13/01/1967, AMENDED BY SPEC. RES. 20/02/1967, 13/05/1968, 04/11/1968, 01/06/1970, 14/06/1976, 22/09/1981, 27/09/1982, 24/09/1984, 20/12/1985 AND 28/09/1988.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO STUDY DEVELOP AND TEACH THE PRINCIPLES AND TECHNIQUES WHICH ARE OF GENERAL APPLICATION IN THE FORMULATION AND USE OF LONG RANGE PLANS AND THE METHODS BY WHICH SUCH PRINCIPLES AND TECHNIQUES CAN BE APPLIED TO LONG RANGE PLANNING IN GOVERNMENT INDUSTRY BUSINESS AND OTHER ORGANISED ACTIVITIES. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.