Dogfen lywodraethu THE TONBRIDGE PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 19 JUNE 1967, 20 JULY 1978, 15 JULY 1998, 3 JULY 2002, 18 JUNE 2003 , 9 JULY 2003 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2005.. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 APR 2016 as amended on 27 Jul 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.