Dogfen lywodraethu THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE EXMOUTH HOSPITAL
Rhif yr elusen: 254353

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 1961 AS AMENDED ON 02 FEB 1980 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 1995 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2016 as amended on 12 May 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF EXMOUTH HOSPITAL (THE LEAGUE) WILL SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF EXMOUTH HOSPITAL AND MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTERESTS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND STAFF AND SUPPORT THE WORK OF EXMOUTH HOSPITAL BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
EXMOUTH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.