Dogfen lywodraethu NORTH WEST SURREY SYNAGOGUE
Rhif yr elusen: 256232

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
LAWS ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 1968 AS AMENDED BY CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED 3 FEBRUARY 2008 AND 23 NOVEMBER 2014 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 04 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PLACE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP FOR JEWS AND OF ADVANCING RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.