Dogfen lywodraethu WORCESTERSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 28TH MARCH 1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED THE 15TH APRIL 1969 AND THE 18TH MAY 1971 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 NOV 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: 3.1.TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF NATURE RESERVES WHICH SHALL BE OWNED, MAINTAINED OR MANAGED BY THE TRUST. 3.2.TO RESTORE, CREATE, STUDY AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION OF PLACES OF ZOOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, MYCOLOGICAL, ECOLOGICAL, GEOLOGICAL, OR GENERAL SCIENTIFIC INTEREST. 3.3.TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND CARRY OUT STUDY AND RESEARCH FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE NATURAL SCIENCES, TO MAKE GRANTS OR DONATIONS FOR SUCH PURPOSES AND TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT THE RECORDING AND PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. 3.4.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF BIODIVERSITY CONSERVATION AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.