Dogfen lywodraethu THE BEDFORDSHIRE AND HERTFORDSHIRE REGIMENT ASSOCIATION OF THE ROYAL ANGLIAN REGIMENT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONVEYANCE DATED 2 MARCH 1921, DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 23 APRIL 1925, CONVEYANCE DATED 11 FEBRUARY 1939, 1 JANUARY 1959 & 15 MAY 1959, RULES DATED 15 MAY 1959, 1 DECEMBER 1976 & 13 OCTOBER 1997.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL & OTHER HELP FOR THE BENEFIT OF FORMER MEMBERS OF THE BEDFORDSHIRE AND HERTFORDSHIRE REGIMENT AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (INCLUDING THE ASSISTANCE OF SUCH FORMER MEMBERS TO OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT IN CIVIL LIFE). B) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE SUCCESSOR REGIMENT, THE ROYAL ANGLIAN REGIMENT BY: I) MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE FORMER BEDFORDSHIRE AND HERTFORDSHIRE REGIMENT AND THE ROYAL ANGLIAN REGIMENT, FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM AND PROVIDING FOR SOCIAL GATHERINGS AND SPORTING EVENTS FOR THEM. II) FOSTERING "ESPRIT-DE-CORPS", COMRADESHIP AND THE WELFARE OF THE REGIMENT AND THE PRESERVATION OF ITS TRADITIONS. III) ENCOURAGING RECRUITMENT FOR THE REGIMENT.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.