Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF HEAD AND NECK ONCOLOGISTS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH OCTOBER 1968 AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION OF 28 APRIL 1995, 7 OCTOBER 1998 AND 26 APRIL 2002 as amended on 17 May 2020 as amended on 13 May 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROMOTING THE STUDY AND TEACHING OF ONCOLOGY APPERTAINING TO THE HEAD AND NECK AND THE MEDICAL SURGICAL RADIO-THERAPEUTIC PATHOLOGICAL CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AND SIMILAR PROBLEMS IN RELATION THERETO AND PROMOTING ONCOLOGICAL RESEARCH APPERTAINING TO THE HEAD AND NECK AND MIDICAL SURGICAL RADIO-THERAPEUTIC PATHOLOGICAL CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AND SIMILAR PROBLEMS IN RELATION THERETO.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.