Dogfen lywodraethu CHESTER GATEWAY THEATRE TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 NOVEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 18 MARCH 1974, 25 JULY 1985 AND 25 JULY 1991, 2 FEBRUARY 1993 AND 15 NOVEMBER 1999.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SONG AND MUSIC, AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR, PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM.)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.