Dogfen lywodraethu MARKET HARBOROUGH DRAMA SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 257746
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/08/1968 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 09/08/2009 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT, STUDY AND PRACTICE OF DRAMATIC ART, IN ALL ITS FORMS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE DISTRICT OF MARKET HARBOROUGH AND ELSEWHERE (FOR FURTHER DESCRIPTION, SEE CONSTITUTION)
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
DISTRICT OF MARKET HARBOROUGH AND ELSEWHERE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.