Dogfen lywodraethu ST ANN'S HOSPICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/02/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/01/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 SEP 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS OR SUFFERING BY:- 1. THE EXPERT CARE AND SUPPORT OF PEOPLE WITH PALLIATIVE AND END OF LIFE NEEDS 2. THE PROVISION OF SERVICES TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELLBEING FOR PATIENTS AND CARERS 3. THE CARE AND SUPPORT OF FAMILY AND FRIENDS WHO HAVE BEEN BEREAVED 4. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HIGH QUALITY PALLIATIVE AND END OF LIFE CARE THROUGHOUT THE COMMUNITY
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.