Dogfen lywodraethu AIREBOROUGH HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 258326

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 11 MARCH 1969 AS AMENDED 9 SEPTEMBER 1969, 11 APRIL 1979, 13 MARCH 1991 AND 9 MARCH 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE FIELD OF HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS AND THE COLLECTION, RECORDING AND PRESERVATION OF ARCHIVE MATERIAL RELATING SPECIFICALLY TO AIREBOROUGH.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
AIREBOROUGH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.