Dogfen lywodraethu THE YORK HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE
Rhif yr elusen: 258700
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 APRIL 1969 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 1973, 9 APRIL 1975 19 MAY 1976, 11 MAY 1977, 24 MARCH 1981 AND 21 JUNE 1982 AND 10 NOVEMBER 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND / OR OLD AGE AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN YORK AND NORTH YORKSHIRE, BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR YORK HOSPITALS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
YORK AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.