Y Gofrestr Elusennau - Y Comisiwn Elusennau SAMARITANS OF KINGSTON UPON HULL
Rhif yr elusen: 1170483-1
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
RULES ADOPTED 27 FEBRUARY 1973 AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 1992, 29 JUNE 2006, 21 MAY 2008 AND 12 MARCH 2013
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:
2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN KINGSTON UPON HULL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING
SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND
2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Maes buddion
HULL, BRIDLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Hanes cofrestru
- 31 Gorffenaf 1969: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
- THE SAMARITANS OF HULL (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.