Dogfen lywodraethu LEIGHTON BUZZARD MENCAP
Rhif yr elusen: 259104

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/04/1969 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/1984 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/2012 as amended on 15 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
Advancing the health, education and the well-being of people with a learning disability and their families and carers (the beneficiaries) by providing, procuring or facilitating care, services and facilities and to advance equality and diversity for people with a learning disability.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTISE LEIGHTON BUZZARD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.