Y Gofrestr Elusennau - Y Comisiwn Elusennau CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT SAMARITANS

Rhif yr elusen: 1166874-1
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
RULES ADOPTED 12 JUNE 1969 AS AMENDED 17 FEBRUARY 1971 , 3 JUNE 1975, 7 MAY 1996 AND 13 FEBRUARY 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION, AND ALSO, WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Maes buddion
CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT
Hanes cofrestru
  • 19 Medi 1969: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill

Dim enwau eraill

Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â