Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF LEARNING DISABLED (NORTH DORSET)
Rhif yr elusen: 260092
Cyfredol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 19/01/1970 AS AMENDED ON 10/04/1990 AS AMENDED ON 04/12/2001 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 31/03/2004 AS AMENDED ON 06/09/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT AT SHERBORNE HOUSES FOR THE LEARNING DISABLED AND CLIENTS OF THE WHITE HOUSE DAY CENTRE BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE SUPPORT FOR THE PURCHASE OF SUCH EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES NO PROVIDED BY STATUTORY MEANS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.