Dogfen lywodraethu THE SEQUAL TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 260119

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 29 NOVEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 1983, 17 OCTOBER 1992, 18 JULY 1998, 2 MARCH 2002 AND 1 FEBRUARY 2003. as amended on 23 May 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The aim of the Association is the relief of persons who have speech, movement or severe learning difficulties and have problems in communicating which require the provision of augmentative speech aids.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.