Dogfen lywodraethu NEW FOREST ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 17 MARCH 1969 AS AMENDED 28 APRIL 1999 AND 28 APRIL 2007 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2016 as amended on 28 Apr 2022 as amended on 28 Apr 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The object of the Association is to promote the preservation of the New Forest for the benefit of the public, to protect and preserve the character, cultural heritage, landscape and amenities of the New Forest and to protect and preserve the areas of scientific and ecological importance and the flora, fungi and fauna of the New Forest. Please note by the proposed Defintions Clause New Forest “means area designated as the New Forest National Park”
Maes buddion
THE NEW FOREST
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.