Dogfen lywodraethu CHARITIES FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE CITY HALL GARDENS AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONVEYANCES DATED 25 MARCH 1937, 29 JULY 1937, 8 JULY 1938, 15 AUGUST 1938, 4 AUGUST 1942, 23 SEPTEMBER 1942 ALL AS AFFECTED BY SCHEME DATED 24 OCTOBER 2001
Gwrthrychau elusennol
50% OF THE INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE OPEN SPACE IN BARKERS POOL IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD KNOWN AS CITY HALL GARDEN AND SUBJECT THERETO IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PARK OR RECREATION GROUND HELD UPON TRUST BY SHEFFIELD CITY COUNCIL, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CHARITY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD; THE REMAINING 50% WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE TRUSTEES OF AND APPLIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY CALLED THE SPIRIT OF SHEFFIELD CHILDREN'S TRUST (1089755)
Maes buddion
SHEFFIELD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.