Dogfen lywodraethu THE HEATHER SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 261407
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 29TH APRIL 1970 AS REVISED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1979 RULES AS AMENDED ON 12/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2015 AS AMENDED ON 11 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED ON 10 SEP 2017 as amended on 14 Sep 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ASSIST THE ADVANCEMENT OF HORTICULTURE AND IN PARTICULAR THE IMPROVEMENT OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE GROWING OF HEATHS AND HEATHERS AND ALLIED PLANTS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.